+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 441
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/7/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 26, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 7, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 31, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 23, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE:
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor