+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 866
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2018: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor