+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor