+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor