+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 487
- Effective date(s) 02/13/2014
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/18/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 13, 2013: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor