+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor