+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 67
- Effective date(s) 03/28/2019
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 78, Nays 11, PNV 6
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
March 12, 2019: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor