+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2013
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/13/2013
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0305
Amendment 1-0 to SB0468
+ − Vote
March 27, 2013: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 9