+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 357
- Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 27, 2019: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor