+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor