+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 196
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 6, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0267)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0065)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 6
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 5, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor