+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor