+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 19, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1