+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2017: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8