+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 5, 2019: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor