+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor