+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 314
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/26/2017
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., and NR Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 18, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor