+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 329
- Effective date(s) 05/09/2017; 01/01/2018
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0367)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0256)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
April 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 29, 2017: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor