+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed to adopt am. 2, Ayes 12, Nays 20
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0205)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 2, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor