+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1028
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/17/18
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 29, 2017: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor