+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0314)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 2/25/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/18/2015
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
March 31, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 31, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor