+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 399
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2014
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0295)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0185)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0185
Amendment 1-0 to SB0408
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 29
March 19, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9