+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 26, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor