+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor