+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2016
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2016
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2016
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/9/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/24/2016
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/24/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/17/2016
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/1/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/1/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor