+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.