+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 388
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2017;
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 1, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/28/2017
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/22/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 1
March 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2017: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2017: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2017: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor