+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 222
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor