+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor