+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor