+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 288
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013
- Action Def. in S. Gov. Ops Comm. to 4/3/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to last cal.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0382
Amendment 1-0 to SB0364
+ − Vote
April 3, 2013: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 8