+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 87
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/25/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/13/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
March 20, 2013: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor