+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 127
- Pub. Ch. 127
- Effective date(s) 04/12/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Placed on consent cal. 2 for Monday, 3-4-13
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 27, 2013: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 8