+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 4
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor