+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 330
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 4/10/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013
- Action Def. in S. Gov. Ops. Comm. to 4/3/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 10, 2013: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor