+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
- Pub. Ch. 250
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 77, Nays 12, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0209)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0101)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0095)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 17, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, referred to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor