+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 304
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/2/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor