+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 486
- Effective date(s) 05/20/2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0504)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0148)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0426)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0390)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 4
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 6, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor