+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor