+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
- Pub. Ch. 119
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 4, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/1/2021
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/16/2021
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor