+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
- Pub. Ch. 464
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 9, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2021: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor