+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 496
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/5/2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 1/25/2018
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor