+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 16
- Effective date(s) 03/24/2017
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 9, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/6/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2017
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 9
March 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
February 28, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor