+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass S., Ayes 15, Nays 8, PNV 3
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
March 26, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2