+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 751
- Effective date(s) 06/22/2020
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 2, PNV 2
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0811)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0680)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
- Recalled from Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
June 2, 2020: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor