+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 372
- Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0309)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0191)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 4-3-19
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/27/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
April 8, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2019: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2019: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor