+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 463
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0415)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0244)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0337)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 14, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor