+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/04/2015
- Pub. Ch. 352
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment 2
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0303)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 4
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0077)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0295)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2