+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 220
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 2
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0341)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0266)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0266
Amendment 1-0 to SB0028
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 30
March 26, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor