+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/11/2022
- Pub. Ch. 1043
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1005)
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 6, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1005)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0590)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0559)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/2/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/2/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/23/2022
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2
- Yeas: 8
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 6
March 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2022: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8